NY A03983 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the chief administrator of the courts shall submit annually a report on the administration, function and effectiveness of the Drug Treatment Court Program during the preceding year.
Title
Establishes the chief administrator of the courts shall submit annually a report on the administration, function and effectiveness of the Drug Treatment Court Program during the preceding year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | print number 3983a |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07638 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means