NY A04061 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for criminal use of a firearm in the first degree when committing a drug related felony offense.
Title
Increases penalties for criminal use of a firearm in the first degree when committing a drug related felony offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07138 (Same As) 2016-03-31 - REFERRED TO CODES