NY A04085 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes exposing a first responder or correction officer to fentanyl, a fentanyl derivative or an opiate containing fentanyl or a fentanyl derivative in the definition of the offense of assault in the first degree.
Title
Includes exposing a first responder or correction officer to fentanyl, a fentanyl derivative or an opiate containing fentanyl or a fentanyl derivative in the definition of the offense of assault in the first degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2023-02-24 | Assembly | print number 4085a |
2023-02-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06427 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES