NY A04106 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the examination of tinted or shaded windows in the periodic inspection of motor vehicles required by law; authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to promulgate any and all rules and regulations necessary.
Title
Includes the examination of tinted or shaded windows in the periodic inspection of motor vehicles required by law; authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to promulgate any and all rules and regulations necessary.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] | Asm. Francisco Moya [D] | Asm. Michael Simanowitz [D] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Alfred Graf [R] | Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.444 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1556 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6034A |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.440 |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03345 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - referred to transportation
S06034 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4106
S06034 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4106