NY A04160 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - held for consideration in social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - held for consideration in social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the personal needs allowance of individuals in nursing homes and individuals in residential programs for victims of domestic violence.
Title
Increases the personal needs allowance of individuals in nursing homes and individuals in residential programs for victims of domestic violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | held for consideration in social services |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | print number 4160a |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | reference changed to social services |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02906 (Same As) 2016-05-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE