NY A04170 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-25 - substituted by s6355a
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-25 - substituted by s6355a
Summary
This bill will allow grandparents who have the written permission of their grandchild's parent or legal guardian to participate in the child's school parent's association or parent-teacher association within a community school district in the City of New York.
Title
Permits membership in certain school related associations by grandparents of certain children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | substituted by s6355a | |
2010-06-21 | amended on third reading 4170b | |
2010-06-21 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2010-06-21 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-21 | recalled from senate | |
2010-06-15 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-06-15 | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED | |
2010-03-15 | 3RD READING CAL.243 | |
2010-03-15 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6355 | |
2010-02-24 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2010-02-24 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-12 | amended on third reading 4170a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.314 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-03-09 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-03-09 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-09 | passed assembly | |
2009-03-05 | advanced to third reading cal.193 | |
2009-03-03 | reported | |
2009-01-30 | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S5928-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
S06355 (Same As) 2010-03-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4170A
S06355 (Same As) 2010-03-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4170A
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04170&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |