NY A04386 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain participants of a supervised collegiate summer baseball league from definition of employee for purposes of workers' compensation coverage.
Title
Exempts certain participants of a supervised collegiate summer baseball league from definition of employee for purposes of workers' compensation coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02357 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to labor