NY A04403 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the redemption of real property subject to a delinquent tax lien.
Title
Relates to the redemption of real property subject to a delinquent tax lien.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.86 |
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.704 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.407 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | substituted for a4403 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.112 |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s1864 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.407 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01864 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.86