NY A04407 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-10)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - substituted by s3237a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - substituted by s3237a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases certain penalties for violating the prohibition of animal fighting.
Title
Increases certain penalties for violating the prohibition of animal fighting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3237a |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.461 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | print number 4407a |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S03237 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.332