NY A04423 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits, for elections after September 1, 2013, the at large election of members of town and village legislative bodies; requires county boards of elections to establish wards for such elections; provides for one time exemption for the first such election; requires reapportionment every 10 years.
Title
Prohibits, for elections after September 1, 2013, the at large election of members of town and village legislative bodies; requires county boards of elections to establish wards for such elections; provides for one time exemption for the first such election; requires reapportionment every 10 years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |