NY A04438 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Under current law, the Banking ,Department makes a periodic assessment of a bank's record in meeting the requirements of the Community Reinvestment Act (CRA). This legislation requires the assessment to also include a separate explanation of the record of the bank pertaining to each of the twelve individual assessment factors listed under the CRA, with a separate discussion of how well the bank satisfied each factor. The discussion relates to loans the bank has made in its community and the scope of its efforts to market small business loans in low and moderate income areas. The explanation is to be made available to the public.
Title
An act to amend the banking law, in relation to assessment of the record of performance of banking institutions in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities
Sponsors
Asm. Karim Camara [D] | Asm. Herman Farrell [D] | Asm. Aurelia Greene [D] | Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] |
Asm. Darryl Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | enacting clause stricken | |
2009-05-04 | recommitted to banks | |
2009-03-19 | advanced to third reading cal.266 | |
2009-03-17 | reported | |
2009-02-04 | referred to banks |