NY A04463 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - print number 4463a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - print number 4463a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the waiver of annual fees for professional fundraisers who complete a course of instruction in the law of ethics in fundraising.
Title
Provides for the waiver of annual fees for professional fundraisers who complete a course of instruction in the law of ethics in fundraising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | print number 4463a |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02156 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - referred to governmental operations