NY A04481 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the provision of criminal history background checks free of charge to mentoring programs operated by not-for-profit corporations.
Title
Relates to the provision of criminal history background checks free of charge to mentoring programs operated by not-for-profit corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | print number 4481a |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S01488 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - referred to children and families