NY A04491 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - 3RD READING CAL.48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - 3RD READING CAL.48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the director of the state office for the aging to the emergency services council
Title
An act to amend the executive law; in relation to making the director of the state office for the aging a member of the emergency services council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | 3RD READING CAL.48 | |
2010-03-01 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2013 | |
2010-02-24 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-02-24 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.334 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-03-02 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-03-02 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-02 | passed assembly | |
2009-02-26 | advanced to third reading cal.166 | |
2009-02-24 | reported | |
2009-02-04 | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S2013 (Same As) 2010-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4491