NY A04530 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits contact lenses manufacturers from setting unilateral pricing policies or agreements for contact lenses; states that court may issue an injunction following application by the attorney general.
Title
Prohibits contact lenses manufacturers from setting unilateral pricing policies or agreements for contact lenses; states that court may issue an injunction following application by the attorney general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04106 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION