NY A04574 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation seeks to protect and strengthen the role of affirmative action officers in all state agencies by providing that each agency have a full-time affirmative action officer that reports directly to the agency head and are provided with continued education opportunities in the area of affirmative action, equal employment opportunity and human rights.
Title
An act to amend the civil service law, in relation to requiring certain state agencies to employ a competitive class affirmative action officer or administrator
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental employees | |
2009-03-24 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-02-05 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S3347 (Same As) 2010-05-03 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED