NY A04591 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to make available all public documents in a digital format on their website in a manner that allows such documents to be printed; provides that no document required by law to remain confidential shall be deemed a public document.
Title
Requires state agencies to make available all public documents in a digital format on their website in a manner that allows such documents to be printed; provides that no document required by law to remain confidential shall be deemed a public document.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.126 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.109 |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.109 |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | print number 4591a |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05807 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE