NY A04612 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a dealer of motor fuel engaged in method of payment pricing to clearly post the price differences based on the method of payment.
Title
Requires a dealer of motor fuel engaged in method of payment pricing to clearly post the price differences based on the method of payment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | print number 4612b |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | print number 4612a |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2013-02-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06380 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION