NY A04630 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - held for consideration in environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires settlement monies from the Navy Grumman groundwater plume are used for the purchase of certain point-of-use filtration systems for certain homes located on the plume.
Title
Requires settlement monies from the Navy Grumman groundwater plume are used for the purchase of certain point-of-use filtration systems for certain homes located on the plume.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Durso [R] | Asm. John Salka [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. John Mikulin [R] |
Asm. Brian Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | print number 4630a |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |