NY A04635 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the state to establish equal employment opportunity and affirmative action programs for state civil service employment; requires the president of the state civil service commission to provide for the development and implementation of affirmative action programs by state agencies for the benefit of minorities, women, persons with disabilities and veterans; requires every state agency to develop and implement an affirmative action program; requires every state agency to have a full-time affirmative action officer who reports directly to the agency head.
Title
Directs the state to establish equal employment opportunity and affirmative action programs for state civil service employment; requires the president of the state civil service commission to provide for the development and implementation of affirmative action programs by state agencies for the benefit of minorities, women, persons with disabilities and veterans; requires every state agency to develop and implement an affirmative action program; requires every state agency to have a full-time affirmative action officer who reports directly to the agency head.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |