NY A04718 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the uniform fire prevention and building code to require the installation of operable portable fire extinguishers in certain R-3 residential occupancies in this state.
Title
Requires the uniform fire prevention and building code to require the installation of operable portable fire extinguishers in certain R-3 residential occupancies in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.167 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-03-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.93 |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2011-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |