NY A04777 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the term of office of an election commissioner from two to four years beginning January first of each odd numbered year.
Title
Increases the term of office of an election commissioner from two to four years beginning January first of each odd numbered year.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] |
Asm. Karen McMahon [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-10-11 | Assembly | print number 4777a |
2023-10-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06933 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING