NY A04785 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - print number 4785a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - print number 4785a
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the importation, manufacture, sale, distribution and use of glue traps, glue boards, and other adhesive-based animal traps.
Title
Prohibits the importation, manufacture, sale, distribution and use of glue traps, glue boards, and other adhesive-based animal traps.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Assembly | print number 4785a |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06314 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6314A