NY A04844 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department to review laws and policies pertaining to free or reduced cost hunting and fishing licenses.
Title
Requires the department to review laws and policies pertaining to free or reduced cost hunting and fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00693 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES