NY A04846 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the nurse practitioners modernization act which allows the practice of registered professional nursing by a certified nurse practitioner to include diagnosis and performance without collaboration of a licensed physician.
Title
Establishes the nurse practitioners modernization act which allows the practice of registered professional nursing by a certified nurse practitioner to include diagnosis and performance without collaboration of a licensed physician.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | print number 4846b |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | print number 4846a |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04611 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN