NY A04866 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-3)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "just energy transition act"; requires a study of competitive options to facilitate the phase-out, replacement and redevelopment of New York state's oldest and most-polluting fossil fueled generation facilities and their sites by the year 2030.
Title
Enacts the "just energy transition act"; requires a study of competitive options to facilitate the phase-out, replacement and redevelopment of New York state's oldest and most-polluting fossil fueled generation facilities and their sites by the year 2030.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | print number 4866c |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | print number 4866b |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | print number 4866a |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2023-02-24 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S02935 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - referred to energy