NY A04880 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a state transportation plan; requires such plan include a minimum twenty-year forecast period at the time of adoption, assessing long-range needs spanning such period, including a forecast of highway pavement and bridge conditions; and requires the commissioner of transportation to submit a report to the governor, the temporary president of the senate, and the speaker of the assembly, beginning September first, two thousand nineteen and semi-annually thereafter, a list of those capital projects in the department's capital program that have experienced major schedule changes or major cost changes in letting schedule or construction cost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a state transportation plan; requires such plan include a minimum twenty-year forecast period at the time of adoption, assessing long-range needs spanning such period, including a forecast of highway pavement and bridge conditions; and requires the commissioner of transportation to submit a report to the governor, the temporary president of the senate, and the speaker of the assembly, beginning September first, two thousand nineteen and semi-annually thereafter, a list of those capital projects in the department's capital program that have experienced major schedule changes or major cost changes in letting schedule or construction cost.

Sponsors

Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]
Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]
Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Christopher Friend [R]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]
Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Mary Walsh [R]
Asm. Peter Lawrence [R]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Daniel Stec [R]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.1235
2019-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1673
2019-05-21SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-21Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.346
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-05Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S01673 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4880

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04880&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04880&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04880
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04880&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04880&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04880&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4880#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback