NY A04898 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to additional information required in annual reports for limited-profit housing companies.
Title
Relates to additional information required in annual reports for limited-profit housing companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.539 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1099 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6200 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.510 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06200 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.539