NY A04917 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - print number 4917b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - print number 4917b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "school anti-violence education act"; creates a school anti-violence education program; provides that funding will be provided through the omnibus school violence prevention grant program.
Title
Enacts the "school anti-violence education act"; creates a school anti-violence education program; provides that funding will be provided through the omnibus school violence prevention grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Assembly | print number 4917b |
2024-04-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | print number 4917a |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2023-02-24 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04598 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4598A