NY A04957 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - substituted by s204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - substituted by s204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides incarcerated individuals with access to breast cancer screenings every two years and information about breast self-examinations.
Title
Provides incarcerated individuals with access to breast cancer screenings every two years and information about breast self-examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | substituted by s204 |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.390 |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00204 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - returned to senate