NY A04959 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts hospitals from the metropolitan commuter transportation mobility tax.
Title
Exempts hospitals from the metropolitan commuter transportation mobility tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02467 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - referred to ways and means