NY A04999 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state energy research and development authority to conduct a study of the technical and economic feasibility and ratepayer impact of a zero-emission electrical system and a reduction in greenhouse gas emissions.
Title
Directs the New York state energy research and development authority to conduct a study of the technical and economic feasibility and ratepayer impact of a zero-emission electrical system and a reduction in greenhouse gas emissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | print number 4999b |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2023-04-04 | Assembly | print number 4999a |
2023-04-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S02474 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE