NY A05020 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of education of any school district in the state to enter into a contract for the sale of advertising space on school athletic fields owned or leased by the school district; prohibits advertisements for tobacco or alcohol products or for political advocacy; requires prior approval of all advertisements by the local board of education; provides that revenue be retained by the school district making such contract; provides provisions do not apply to cities with a population of one million or more.
Title
Authorizes the board of education of any school district in the state to enter into a contract for the sale of advertising space on school athletic fields owned or leased by the school district; prohibits advertisements for tobacco or alcohol products or for political advocacy; requires prior approval of all advertisements by the local board of education; provides that revenue be retained by the school district making such contract; provides provisions do not apply to cities with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01021 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to education