NY A05095 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows canal corporation to waive fee for work permit for project on canal lands if it adds value to lands at no cost to canal corporation or state.
Title
Allows canal corporation to waive fee for work permit for project on canal lands if it adds value to lands at no cost to canal corporation or state.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Oaks [R] | Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Jane Corwin [R] | Asm. Tony Jordan [R] |
Asm. Joseph Saladino [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Steven McLaughlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.376 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1511 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4912 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.440 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-02-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04912 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5095