NY A05157 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Woodbury, Orange county, to impose, by local law, a tax on hotel and motel occupancy of up to five percent of the per diem rental rate therefor; sets procedures for collection, enforcement, and adjudication; provides for deposit of revenues into the general fund of the town and their application to any lawful purpose.
Title
Authorizes the town of Woodbury, Orange county, to impose, by local law, a tax on hotel and motel occupancy of up to five percent of the per diem rental rate therefor; sets procedures for collection, enforcement, and adjudication; provides for deposit of revenues into the general fund of the town and their application to any lawful purpose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-28 | Senate | tabled |
2015-12-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.311 |
2015-12-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1913 |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.229 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.229 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03819 (Same As) 2015-02-18 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS