NY A05209 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the right of the people to bear and keep arms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the right of the people to bear and keep arms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13Assemblyheld for consideration in codes
2019-03-14Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-02-14Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-02-07Assemblyreferred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback