NY A05235 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.445
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.445
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of transportation to conduct a study of level grade rail crossings and to submit a report to the governor and the legislature on or before April 1, 2017.
Title
Directs the department of transportation to conduct a study of level grade rail crossings and to submit a report to the governor and the legislature on or before April 1, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.445 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-05-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.842 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3458B |
2016-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5235b |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.202 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.644 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.644 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 5235a |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03458 (Same As) 2016-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5235B