NY A05241 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires physicians who are re-registering for their license to complete fifty hours of continuing medical education.
Title
Requires physicians who are re-registering for their license to complete fifty hours of continuing medical education.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] |
Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | print number 5241a |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07578 (Same As) 2016-05-10 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION