NY A05281 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the New York state health care quality and cost containment commission shall: evaluate each mandated benefit; investigate current practices of health plans with regard to the mandated benefit; investigate the potential premium impact of repealing and/or modifying the mandated benefits on all segments of the insurance market; hold at least two public hearings; submit a report to the legislature; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that the New York state health care quality and cost containment commission shall: evaluate each mandated benefit; investigate current practices of health plans with regard to the mandated benefit; investigate the potential premium impact of repealing and/or modifying the mandated benefits on all segments of the insurance market; hold at least two public hearings; submit a report to the legislature; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | held for consideration in insurance |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | print number 5281a |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01668 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1668A