NY A05366 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - advanced to third reading cal.369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - advanced to third reading cal.369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the legislature to increase the number of justices of the supreme court in any judicial district.
Title
Authorizes the legislature to increase the number of justices of the supreme court in any judicial district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.369 |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05414 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - referred to judiciary