NY A05375 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - print number 5375a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - print number 5375a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Unemployment Insurance Liability Act of 2014;" requires that employers that are relocated out of New York State continue to contribute to the unemployment insurance fund when former employees of the employer are receiving benefits for two quarters; mandates that employers shall identify all employees being terminated as a result of the relocation and include the amount of weekly wages paid to such individuals as part of the final quarterly payroll report submitted to the department of insurance.
Title
Enacts the "Unemployment Insurance Liability Act of 2014;" requires that employers that are relocated out of New York State continue to contribute to the unemployment insurance fund when former employees of the employer are receiving benefits for two quarters; mandates that employers shall identify all employees being terminated as a result of the relocation and include the amount of weekly wages paid to such individuals as part of the final quarterly payroll report submitted to the department of insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Assembly | print number 5375a |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02706 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2706A