NY A05454 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-18 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-18 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to synthetic cannabinoids, synthetic cannabinoid analog and substituted cathinones and prohibits the production and sale thereof.
Title
Relates to synthetic cannabinoids, synthetic cannabinoid analog and substituted cathinones and prohibits the production and sale thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | print number 5454a |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04720 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH