NY A05465 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements a drug disposal demonstration program.
Title
Implements a drug disposal demonstration program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.488 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.725 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3985A |
2014-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5465a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.255 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.157 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03985 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5465A