NY A05474 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - substituted by s1910
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - substituted by s1910
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town code enforcement officer/building inspector and the code officer in the town of Kirkwood, in the county of Broome, to reside outside of such town, so long as such person resides in the county of Broome or an adjoining county.
Title
Authorizes the town code enforcement officer/building inspector and the code officer in the town of Kirkwood, in the county of Broome, to reside outside of such town, so long as such person resides in the county of Broome or an adjoining county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s1910 |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.409 |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01910 (Same As) 2013-07-12 - SIGNED CHAP.139