NY A05492 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions of the environmental conservation law requiring hunters to display back tags.
Title
Repeals provisions of the environmental conservation law requiring hunters to display back tags.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04951 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION