NY A05531 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - substituted by s1914
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - substituted by s1914
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires tourism promotion agencies seeking matching economic development funds to have a program to encourage visitation of state parks and historic sites.
Title
Requires tourism promotion agencies seeking matching economic development funds to have a program to encourage visitation of state parks and historic sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s1914 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.549 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.549 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-23 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S01914 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.43