NY A05617 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of special investigation within the department of law to investigate and prosecute any alleged criminal offense or offenses committed by a police officer or peace officer, concerning the death of any person as a result of any encounter with such police officer or peace officer.
Title
Establishes the office of special investigation within the department of law to investigate and prosecute any alleged criminal offense or offenses committed by a police officer or peace officer, concerning the death of any person as a result of any encounter with such police officer or peace officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.399 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.24 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.24 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S09168 (Same As) 2018-09-17 - REFERRED TO RULES