NY A05618 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes restrictions on consumer and employment contracts.
Title
Establishes restrictions on consumer and employment contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.182 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.190 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.190 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05799 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY