NY A05623 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the de-regulation of rent-stabilized housing accommodations; eliminates rent regulation for any regulated housing accommodation that becomes vacant on or after June 16, 2024; makes exceptions.
Title
Relates to the de-regulation of rent-stabilized housing accommodations; eliminates rent regulation for any regulated housing accommodation that becomes vacant on or after June 16, 2024; makes exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | held for consideration in housing |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | referred to housing |