NY A05626 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-12 - print number 5626a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-12 - print number 5626a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for absentee voting for municipalities, school and fire districts on local elections.
Title
Provides for absentee voting for municipalities, school and fire districts on local elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | print number 5626a | |
2010-03-12 | amend and recommit to election law | |
2010-01-06 | referred to election law | |
2009-02-13 | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S6076 (Same As) 2010-03-25 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING